This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:24:26 (UTC).

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST VS MALDONADO, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST filed an Other lawsuit against MALDONADO, ROBERT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G, COMPTON, KENT and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST

Defendant

MALDONADO, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT, FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Filing ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Default Entered AGAINST ROBERT MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service (NMA) ROBERT MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Motion For Default On ROBERT MALDONADO (CLERKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ROBERT MALDONADO 121018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ROBERT MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint FOR DAMAGES W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004544CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crescent Bank and Trust is a litigant