Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:58:28 (UTC).

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST VS CARMICHAEL, DEBRA

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARMICHAEL, DEBRA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST

Defendant

CARMICHAEL, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

11/13/2018:Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DEBRA CARMICHAEL

01/21/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DEBRA CARMICHAEL

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

12/03/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DEBRA CARMICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004106SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Event Date: 01/28/2019 13:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less