This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/08/2019 at 06:01:43 (UTC).

CRAPARO, SEAN THOMAS VS GALON, DAVID NICHOLAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 CRAPARO, SEAN THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GALON, DAVID NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAPARO, SEAN THOMAS

Defendants

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPAN

GALON, LOIS ANN

GALON, DAVID NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYCE, ROBERT T

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To DAVID NICHOLAS GALON AS NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

03/13/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To DAVID NICHOLAS GALON AS NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To LOIS ANN GALON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

03/13/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To LOIS ANN GALON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice of Filing PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice of Filing PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To DAVID NICHOLAS GALON AS NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To LOIS ANN GALON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Case 512019CA000757CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To LOIS ANN GALON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DAVID NICHOLAS GALON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less