This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/30/2020 at 01:20:20 (UTC).

CPL GROUP INC Et Al VS WHEELER, STEFAN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 CPL GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHEELER, STEFAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

CPL GROUP INC

DBA RENT KING

Defendant

WHEELER, STEFAN

 

Court Documents

Writ Of Replevin Returned Served 120820

12/14/2020:Writ Of Replevin Returned Served 120820

Order To Show Cause 01/11/21 AT 9:00AM TELEPHONIC

12/10/2020:Order To Show Cause 01/11/21 AT 9:00AM TELEPHONIC

Order on Emergency Motion (Does Not Qualify as an Emergency)

11/25/2020:Order on Emergency Motion (Does Not Qualify as an Emergency)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Of Replevin Returned Served 120820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder To Show Cause 01/11/21 AT 9:00AM TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEMERGENCY PREJUDGMENT Writ Of Replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder (EMERGENCY BREAK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Emergency Motion (Does Not Qualify as an Emergency)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAffidavit IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY BREAK ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document AUTHORIZATION OF PRINCIPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketReplevin Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition FOR BREAK ORDER (EMERGENCY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEmergency VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR ISSUANCE OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase 512020SC004590SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less