This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:36:47 (UTC).

COTTO, RIKKI L

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 COTTO, RIKKI L was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Defendant

COTTO, RIKKI L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 010319 RIKKI L COTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Default Entered NIKKI L COTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Motion For Default On ON RIKKI L COTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served POSTED RIKKI L COTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; RIKKI L COTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case 512018CC004651CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.