This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 16:18:26 (UTC).

COOPER, MICHELLE L VS COOPER, DERICK L

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 COOPER, MICHELLE L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COOPER, DERICK L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DISKEY, DANIEL D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DISKEY, DANIEL D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, MICHELLE L

Defendant

COOPER, DERICK L

Not Classified By Court

LARUE, MICHELLE L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MOTLEY, RICHARD ALLEN

KENNEDY, RAESEEN CANDICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Hearing BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 041119 @ 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Order Of Referral To General Master Or Magistrate LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Memorandum FROM CT ADMN TO JUDGE DISKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Final Notice to Comply with Referral to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Referral to Family Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Order For Temporary Standing No Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Motion FOR COURT PROVIDED MEDIATION FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Summons Returned Served DERICK L COOPER 122618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Answer TO PETITION FILED BY RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • Financial Affidavit MICHELLE L COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Supplemental Information Regarding Parties Form per A.O. No.2016-030 PA/PI-CIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Copy of Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Clerk Approved Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.