Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2019 at 13:51:53 (UTC).

COCHRAN, BERNICE Et Al VS ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY I Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 COCHRAN, BERNICE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY I. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COCHRAN, BERNICE

COCHRAN, MICHAEL

Defendants

ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY I

PFISTER, LANE

SGS REAL ESTATE LLC

PENZER, DAIVD

Not Classified By Court

EXIT ELITE REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAAS, RAYMOND A

Defendant Attorneys

URETA, ROBERTO MANUEL

STAMATAKIS, SCOTT DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Taking Deposition

11/20/2017:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Notice of Hearing 010418@3PM

11/20/2017:Notice of Hearing 010418@3PM

Notice Of Taking Deposition RESCHEDULED

11/17/2017:Notice Of Taking Deposition RESCHEDULED

Answer TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVID PENZER AND SGS REAL ESTATE LLC

09/12/2017:Answer TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVID PENZER AND SGS REAL ESTATE LLC

Summons Returned Served ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY INC; 071017

07/14/2017:Summons Returned Served ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY INC; 071017

Summons Returned Served BOLTER & CARR INVESTIGATIONS INC; 071117

07/14/2017:Summons Returned Served BOLTER & CARR INVESTIGATIONS INC; 071117

Summons Returned Served LANE PFISTER; 070117

07/07/2017:Summons Returned Served LANE PFISTER; 070117

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON LANE PFISTER

06/27/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON LANE PFISTER

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON SGA REAL ESTATE, LLC

06/27/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON SGA REAL ESTATE, LLC

Mediation Results Report SETTLEMENT

04/25/2018:Mediation Results Report SETTLEMENT

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

01/02/2018:ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

Notice Of Taking Deposition

11/20/2017:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 121817 @10AM AND 2PM

11/20/2017:Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 121817 @10AM AND 2PM

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTFS

10/13/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTFS

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition SECOND

10/05/2017:Amended Notice of Taking Deposition SECOND

Summons Returned Served DAVID PENZER; 070117

07/07/2017:Summons Returned Served DAVID PENZER; 070117

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON DAVID PENZER

06/27/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON DAVID PENZER

Complaint

06/15/2017:Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Order ON DECEMBER 12, 2018 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Response to Motion TO PLTFS CORRECTED/AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND CONTEMPT OF COURT BY SCOTT D STAMATAKIS; FILED BY SCOTT D STAMATAKIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice of Filing UNATTACHED COMPLAINT; FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Objection TO ATTORNEY SCOTT STAMATAKIS AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice of Hearing 121218@10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice of Hearing ON 121218 AT 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Motion For Contempt PL

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served LANE PFISTER; 070117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON ASAP APPRAISALS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON LANE PFISTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON DAVID PENZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON SGA REAL ESTATE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Case 512017CA001919CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A