This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 17:58:12 (UTC).

COCHA, JESSICA VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 COCHA, JESSICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER and BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCHA, JESSICA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL, JERROD MACKENZIE

Defendant Attorney

GUZZI, GARY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Mediation Agreement - AN IMPASSE

05/05/2022:Mediation Agreement - AN IMPASSE

Order Setting Jury Trial 101722 AT 9:00AM AND PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 091422 AT 10:30AM

04/05/2022:Order Setting Jury Trial 101722 AT 9:00AM AND PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 091422 AT 10:30AM

Order ON JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND EXTENSION OF PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES

03/24/2022:Order ON JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND EXTENSION OF PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES

Motion To Continue PARTIES

03/11/2022:Motion To Continue PARTIES

NOTICE OF Mediation

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF Mediation

Mediation Agreement

03/11/2022:Mediation Agreement

Final Notice to Set Court Provided Mediation

03/02/2022:Final Notice to Set Court Provided Mediation

Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY JESSICA COCHA

02/21/2022:Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY JESSICA COCHA

Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

02/14/2022:Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001591CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL JERROD M