This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2022 at 14:56:47 (UTC).

COASTLINE BOATLIFT COVERS NATU Et Al VS PASCO COUNTY

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 COASTLINE BOATLIFT COVERS NATU filed an Other lawsuit against PASCO COUNTY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COASTLINE BOATLIFT COVERS NATU

GAMBLE, JEROMY

GAMBLE, REBECCA

Defendant

PASCO COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBENSTEIN, LAUREN CHRIST

Defendant Attorney

MOORE, PATRICK A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

12/16/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/16/2021:Complaint

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

12/16/2021:Exhibit EXHIBIT A

Exhibit COMPOSITE EXHIBIT B

12/16/2021:Exhibit COMPOSITE EXHIBIT B

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

12/16/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

12/20/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice Of Appearance DF

12/22/2021:Notice Of Appearance DF

Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

02/14/2022:Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit COMPOSITE EXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA002892CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASCO COUNTY is a litigant