This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 10:19:23 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS FINTEL, STEPHANIE R

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FINTEL, STEPHANIE R. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

FINTEL, STEPHANIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREY, PATRICK A

 

Court Documents

Pre-Trial Conference Order

12/29/2021:Pre-Trial Conference Order

County Court Mediation Agreement

12/29/2021:County Court Mediation Agreement

Return of Service on Summons Served ONS STEPHANIE R FINTEL 100721 NMA

10/12/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ONS STEPHANIE R FINTEL 100721 NMA

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 2:30 PM STEPHANIE R FINTEL

10/05/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 2:30 PM STEPHANIE R FINTEL

Alias or Pluries Summons to be Issued

09/22/2021:Alias or Pluries Summons to be Issued

Notice Case Has Been Transferred to Pasco County

09/15/2021:Notice Case Has Been Transferred to Pasco County

Motion to Transfer TO PASCO COUNTY FILED BY PLTF

09/14/2021:Motion to Transfer TO PASCO COUNTY FILED BY PLTF

Order Granting MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/14/2021:Order Granting MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

Order Transferring Case FROM PINELLAS COUNTY TO PASCO COUNTY

09/14/2021:Order Transferring Case FROM PINELLAS COUNTY TO PASCO COUNTY

Order STAYING DISMISSAL

09/14/2021:Order STAYING DISMISSAL

Order Granting MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

09/14/2021:Order Granting MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO STAYY DISMISSAL

09/14/2021:SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO STAYY DISMISSAL

Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION SENT TO STEPHANIE R. FINTEL

09/14/2021:Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION SENT TO STEPHANIE R. FINTEL

Returned Mail RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

09/14/2021:Returned Mail RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION SENT TO PATRICK A CAREY

09/14/2021:Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION SENT TO PATRICK A CAREY

Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION : STEPHANIE R FINTEL

09/14/2021:Notice OF LACK OF PROSECUTION : STEPHANIE R FINTEL

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved

09/14/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved

Summons Issued And Returned To COPY 2 PLTF/PLTF ATTY

09/14/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To COPY 2 PLTF/PLTF ATTY

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/29/2021 14:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: Robert D Sumner Judicial Cente DC Cou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty Court Mediation Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 2:30 PM STEPHANIE R FINTEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias or Pluries Summons to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Case Has Been Transferred to Pasco County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer TO PASCO COUNTY FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Transferring Case FROM PINELLAS COUNTY TO PASCO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/ATTORNEY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence FROM THE CLERK TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document : CASE SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred To Pasco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005250SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK A CAREY