This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 18:37:14 (UTC).

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS VS PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC TRUSTEE OF

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC TRUSTEE OF. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF

Defendants

REGIONS BANK

TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC TRUSTEE O

REVUELTA, JOSE C

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPA

NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS

FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY AND

Not Classified By Court

TRUST NO. 27801BR

AMSOUTH BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWENK, MORGAN BOURDAT

Defendant Attorneys

MASSEY, STARLETT M

FRAZIER, NATHAN A

 

Court Documents

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 072016

06/01/2016:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 072016

Notice Of Cancellation OF HEARING 050416

04/21/2016:Notice Of Cancellation OF HEARING 050416

Notice Of Hearing 060416 1010AM

04/21/2016:Notice Of Hearing 060416 1010AM

Motion (EMERGENCY) TO STOP ENTRY OF THE CONSENT JUDGMENT AND DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS, FILED BY NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC. Denied After Review By Court 030416 Judge Babb

03/03/2016:Motion (EMERGENCY) TO STOP ENTRY OF THE CONSENT JUDGMENT AND DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS, FILED BY NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC. Denied After Review By Court 030416 Judge Babb

Notice Of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF OWNERSHIP AND AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING

02/02/2016:Notice Of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF OWNERSHIP AND AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING

Certificate Of Compliance WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

02/02/2016:Certificate Of Compliance WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

Motion To Dismiss FILED BY PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC

01/04/2016:Motion To Dismiss FILED BY PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC

Motion For Default On (JUDICIAL) TRUSTEE OF PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC OF AS TRUSTEE UNDER A TRUST AGREEMENT AND KNOWN AS TRUST NO 27801BR DATED 030613

12/21/2015:Motion For Default On (JUDICIAL) TRUSTEE OF PRIVE AUTOMOTIVE LLC OF AS TRUSTEE UNDER A TRUST AGREEMENT AND KNOWN AS TRUST NO 27801BR DATED 030613

(ORIGINAL) Motion For Default On JOSE C REVUELTA; TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY AND LAND ROVER CAPITAL GROUP; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY WITH ATTACHED MILITARY STATUS AND RETURN SERVICE DOCS

10/19/2015:(ORIGINAL) Motion For Default On JOSE C REVUELTA; TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY AND LAND ROVER CAPITAL GROUP; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY WITH ATTACHED MILITARY STATUS AND RETURN SERVICE DOCS

Default Entered ON JOSE C REVUELTA; TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; FORD MORTOR CREDIT CO; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

10/19/2015:Default Entered ON JOSE C REVUELTA; TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; FORD MORTOR CREDIT CO; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

Motion For Default On JOSE C REVUELTA, TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY AND LAND ROVER CAPITAL GROUP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY

10/16/2015:Motion For Default On JOSE C REVUELTA, TAMPA BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY AND LAND ROVER CAPITAL GROUP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY

Correspondence To Press For Publication BUSINESS OBSERVER BEGINNING 10/9/15

10/06/2015:Correspondence To Press For Publication BUSINESS OBSERVER BEGINNING 10/9/15

Summons Returned Served 081815 NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

09/21/2015:Summons Returned Served 081815 NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT

09/21/2015:Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT

Summons Returned Unserved 081415 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY

09/21/2015:Summons Returned Unserved 081415 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; OBO REGIONS BANK

08/26/2015:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; OBO REGIONS BANK

Answer And Affirmative Defense NORTWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

08/19/2015:Answer And Affirmative Defense NORTWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON TRUSTEE OF PRIVE AJUTOMOTIVE LLC

08/07/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON TRUSTEE OF PRIVE AJUTOMOTIVE LLC

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCertificate Of Disbursements $0.00 MLD 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCertificate Of Title Issued To CHRISTIANA TRUST, A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2013-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketCertificate Of Sale With Attached Proof Of Publica SOLD TO CHRISTIANA TRUST $126,500.00 MLD 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketProof Of Publication 072016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Sale 072016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 072016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Filing AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTYS FEES, FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Filing LOST NOTICE AFFIDAVIT, FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketAffidavit of Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON REGIONS BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002266CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketInformation Sheet VALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prive Automotive LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where AMSOUTH BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Tampa Bay Federal Credit Union is a litigant