Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 17:05:30 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS TAYLOR, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAYLOR, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

TAYLOR, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

Defendant Attorney

FLORIN, SCOTT CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

12/27/2018:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Stipulation AND REQUEST TO INVOKE CIVIL RULES AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice Of Service OF DEF FIRST REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY INCLUDING INTERROGATORIES REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 012919 MATTHEW TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 022519 AT 230PM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Case 512018SC004705SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • File Verified To This Point EY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Event Date: 02/25/2019 14:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B; Defendant Attorney: FLORIN, SCOTT CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORIN , SCOTT CRAIG