Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:23:58 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS HADDOX, CONNIE I

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HADDOX, CONNIE I. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

HADDOX, CONNIE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARDO, MONIQUE KRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing 021519 AT 1015AM

01/28/2019:Notice of Hearing 021519 AT 1015AM

Notice of Hearing 021519 @1015AM

01/28/2019:Notice of Hearing 021519 @1015AM

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

03/20/2019:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLTF

08/07/2019:Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLTF

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, CONNIE I HADDOX

11/29/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, CONNIE I HADDOX

Complaint

11/13/2018:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • Order Granting PLF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 021519 AT 1015AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 021519 @1015AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Motion To Strike FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Answer CONNIE HADDOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served FOR DEFENDANT/CONNIE I HADDOX ON 120618 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, CONNIE I HADDOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004538CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less