Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:52:34 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS GUADALUPE, JENNIFER L

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUADALUPE, JENNIFER L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

GUADALUPE, JENNIFER L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

Defendant Attorney

CIPRIANO, RICHARD FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/27/2019 @ 1:30 PM; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

01/08/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/27/2019 @ 1:30 PM; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

Statement Of Claim; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

12/03/2018:Statement Of Claim; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Stipulation TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense TO COMPLAINT; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Request To Produce FIRST TO PLAINTIFF; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLAINTIFF FIRST; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Request For Admissions TO PLAINTIFF; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 012119; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/27/2019 @ 1:30 PM; GUADALUPE JENNIFER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case 512018SC004352SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 12/3/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information WITHIN COURT FILING; CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Event Date: 02/27/2019 13:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B; Defendant Attorney: CIPRIANO, RICHARD F III

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE