This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/06/2019 at 08:30:28 (UTC).

CATELLIER, ROLAND VS ANNIS, DAVID Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CATELLIER, ROLAND filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANNIS, DAVID. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATELLIER, ROLAND

Defendants

ANNIS, DAVID

MAJOR, ALICIA M

 

Court Documents

Default Entered DAVID ANNIS AND ALICIA M MAJOR

01/24/2019:Default Entered DAVID ANNIS AND ALICIA M MAJOR

Motion For Default Judgment

01/22/2019:Motion For Default Judgment

Motion For Default On COURTS

01/22/2019:Motion For Default On COURTS

Motion For Default On CLERKS

01/22/2019:Motion For Default On CLERKS

Affidavit Of Non Military Service ALICIA M MAJOR

01/22/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service ALICIA M MAJOR

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DAVID ANNIS

01/22/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DAVID ANNIS

Summons Returned Served POSTED; ALICIA M MAJOR 010319

01/10/2019:Summons Returned Served POSTED; ALICIA M MAJOR 010319

Summons Returned Served POSTED; DAVID ANNIS 010319

01/10/2019:Summons Returned Served POSTED; DAVID ANNIS 010319

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR DAVID ANNIS

01/02/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR DAVID ANNIS

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR ALICA M MAJOR

01/02/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR ALICA M MAJOR

Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

01/28/2019:Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

01/02/2019:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Default Entered DAVID ANNIS AND ALICIA M MAJOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DAVID ANNIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service ALICIA M MAJOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; DAVID ANNIS 010319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; ALICIA M MAJOR 010319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case 512019CC000008CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR DAVID ANNIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR ALICA M MAJOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less