This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 09/16/2022 at 06:03:41 (UTC).

CASTALDO, LOUISE VS GOAL-FLORIDA LLC DBA GOAL PROP Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 CASTALDO, LOUISE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOAL-FLORIDA LLC DBA GOAL PROP. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTALDO, LOUISE

Defendants

GOAL-FLORIDA LLC DBA GOAL PROP

MNSF II W1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH, BARBARA LORRAINE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/17/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/17/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/17/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/17/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Request For Admissions

08/17/2022:Request For Admissions

Request For Admissions

08/17/2022:Request For Admissions

Request To Produce

08/17/2022:Request To Produce

Request To Produce

08/17/2022:Request To Produce

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

08/17/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

08/17/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

08/22/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

08/22/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Return of Service on Summons Served ON MNSF IEW1(?) LLC 090722

09/07/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON MNSF IEW1(?) LLC 090722

Return of Service on Summons Served ON GOAL-FLORIDA LLC 090722

09/07/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON GOAL-FLORIDA LLC 090722

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON GOAL-FLORIDA LLC 090722

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON MNSF IEW1(?) LLC 090722

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA002154CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less