This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/10/2023 at 08:41:28 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP, LLC VS CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY IN

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 THE KIDWELL GROUP, LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY IN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP, LLC

Defendant

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY IN

Assignee

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE IGNACIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNON, HANS

Defendant Attorney

HIRSCHKOWITZ, MICHAEL STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

03/02/2023:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

03/02/2023:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

03/02/2023:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Request To Produce FILED BY PLF

03/02/2023:Request To Produce FILED BY PLF

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO CYPRESS PROPERTY

03/02/2023:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO CYPRESS PROPERTY

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLF

03/02/2023:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLF

Notice Designating Email Address

03/02/2023:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

03/03/2023:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice of Service of Process on the Insurance Commissioner on Behalf of CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

03/24/2023:Notice of Service of Process on the Insurance Commissioner on Behalf of CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

Motion To Dismiss FILED BY CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS.

04/12/2023:Motion To Dismiss FILED BY CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS.

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

05/25/2023:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion To Dismiss FILED BY CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process on the Insurance Commissioner on Behalf of CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS. CO.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Designating Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY PLF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO CYPRESS PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PLF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

DocketCase 512023CC000956CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less