This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:31:23 (UTC).

CARLTON ARMS OF MAGNOLIA VALLE VS LEWIS, ATHENA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 CARLTON ARMS OF MAGNOLIA VALLE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEWIS, ATHENA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLTON ARMS OF MAGNOLIA VALLE

Defendants

LEWIS, DANIEL

LEWIS, ATHENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNETT, BEVERLY R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/17/2020:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST DANIEL LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST ATHENA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served POSTED 092420 DANIEL LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served POSTED 092420 ATHENA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR DANIEL LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR ATHENA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DANIEL LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service ATHENA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002496CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less