This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 06:03:03 (UTC).

CAREY, MICHAEL P VS SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 CAREY, MICHAEL P filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROGER, GREGORY G and GROGER, GREGORY G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROGER, GREGORY G

GROGER, GREGORY G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREY, MICHAEL P

Defendants

SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM

SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANCO, ANDREW PAUL

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC 100920

10/12/2020:Return of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC 100920

Return of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC 100920

10/12/2020:Return of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC 100920

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

09/21/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC

09/21/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC 100920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC 100920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR SADDLEBROOK RESORTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CFG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest To Produce SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest To Produce SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories SADDLEBROOK RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CA002121CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less