Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:25:09 (UTC).

CAPPAGLI, FRANK VS DAPRON, SARA C

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CAPPAGLI, FRANK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAPRON, SARA C. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPPAGLI, FRANK

Defendant

DAPRON, SARA C

Not Classified By Court

CAPPAGLI, FRANK R

 

Court Documents

Default Denied SARA C DAPRON (PARTY FILED PAPER)

11/28/2018:Default Denied SARA C DAPRON (PARTY FILED PAPER)

Affidavit Of Non Military Service SARA C DAPRON

11/13/2018:Affidavit Of Non Military Service SARA C DAPRON

Summons Returned Served SARA DAPRON 111318

11/19/2018:Summons Returned Served SARA DAPRON 111318

Motion For Default Judgment

11/21/2018:Motion For Default Judgment

Writ of Possession Returned Served 121818 SARA C DAPRON

12/21/2018:Writ of Possession Returned Served 121818 SARA C DAPRON

Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

12/10/2018:Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/SARA C DAPRON

11/13/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/SARA C DAPRON

Motion For Default On CLERKS

11/21/2018:Motion For Default On CLERKS

Motion For Default On COURTS

11/21/2018:Motion For Default On COURTS

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

11/13/2018:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121818 SARA C DAPRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Order OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Default Denied SARA C DAPRON (PARTY FILED PAPER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Summons Returned Served SARA DAPRON 111318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Answer FILED BY SARA DAPRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/SARA C DAPRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service SARA C DAPRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004479CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less