This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:17:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A. VS CURTIS L SNYDER

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N A filed an Other lawsuit against CURTIS L SNYDER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I, ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

CURTIS L SNYDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Confidential Information IN COMPLAINT ATTACHMENT

08/09/2021:Notice Of Confidential Information IN COMPLAINT ATTACHMENT

Civil Cover Sheet

08/09/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Notice Designating Email Address KEVIN SPINOZZA ESQ OBO PLTF

08/09/2021:Notice Designating Email Address KEVIN SPINOZZA ESQ OBO PLTF

Affidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS SYNDER

08/09/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS SYNDER

Summons to be Issued by Clerk CURTIS L SNYDER

08/09/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk CURTIS L SNYDER

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/10/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Return of Service on Summons Served ON CURTIS L SNYDER 081421

08/23/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON CURTIS L SNYDER 081421

Motion For Default On AGAINST CURTIS L SNYDER

11/30/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST CURTIS L SNYDER

Affidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS L SNYDER

11/30/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS L SNYDER

Return of Service on Summons Served 081421 CURTIS L SNYDER

11/30/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served 081421 CURTIS L SNYDER

Default Entered CURTIS L SNYDER

12/07/2021:Default Entered CURTIS L SNYDER

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLTF

12/14/2021:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLTF

Affidavit As To Costs

12/14/2021:Affidavit As To Costs

Affidavit

12/14/2021:Affidavit

Default Judgment

12/15/2021:Default Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit As To Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered CURTIS L SNYDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 081421 CURTIS L SNYDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS L SNYDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST CURTIS L SNYDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON CURTIS L SNYDER 081421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 08092021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk CURTIS L SNYDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service CURTIS SYNDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address KEVIN SPINOZZA ESQ OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint W/ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information IN COMPLAINT ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003079CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin