This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:34:16 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A. VS ALESI, CATHY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N A filed an Other lawsuit against ALESI, CATHY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A.

Defendants

ALESI, CATHY

CATHY ALESI INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To; ALESI CATHY

01/23/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To; ALESI CATHY

Summons Issued And Returned To; CATHY ALESI INC

01/23/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To; CATHY ALESI INC

Civil Cover Sheet

01/21/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/21/2022:Complaint

Notice Designating Email Address

01/21/2022:Notice Designating Email Address

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

01/21/2022:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/21/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/21/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

02/05/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

02/05/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 020122 CATHY ALESI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 012122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To; CATHY ALESI INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To; ALESI CATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC000269CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin