This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:53:14 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC VS GROVE MARY SUSAN UNKNOWN SPOUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GROVE MARY SUSAN UNKNOWN SPOUS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

GROVE MARY SUSAN UNKNOWN SPOUS

VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI

GROVE, MARY SUSAN

Not Classified By Court

BARNETT, MARY SUSAN

BARNETT MARY SUSAN UNKNOWN SPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

12/13/2018:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal PL

05/20/2019:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal PL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 010919 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ON VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC 011119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY SUSAN GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ON MARY SUSAN GROVE 010919 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To MARY SUSAN GROVE FKA MARY SUSAN BARNETT ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY SUSAN GROVE FKA MARY SUSAN BARNETT ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Form D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Form C Notice to Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Verified Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS A-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Value Calculation for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case 512018CA003935CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI is a litigant

Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Church, Kelley Louise