Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2019 at 12:18:53 (UTC).

CALATLANTIC GROUP INC VS 84 LUMBER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 CALATLANTIC GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 84 LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALATLANTIC GROUP INC

Defendants

84 LUMBER COMPANY

NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC

FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO IN

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I

BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAFARO, ROCCO

WALLS, JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, PEDRO WILSON

HARRIGAN, DAVID S

KALKINS, HONEY DEE

 

Court Documents

Order For Substitution Counsel

08/14/2018:Order For Substitution Counsel

Return of Service on Summons Served NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC; 102117

12/27/2017:Return of Service on Summons Served NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC; 102117

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO NICE CLEAINING & PAINTING INC.

12/21/2017:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO NICE CLEAINING & PAINTING INC.

Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

12/01/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Summons Issued And Returned To SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

11/17/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons Issued And Returned To BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC ISSUED ATTY

09/13/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC ISSUED ATTY

09/13/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO INC ISSUED ATTY

09/13/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO INC ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To 84 LUMBER COMPANY ISSUED ATTY

09/13/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To 84 LUMBER COMPANY ISSUED ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Substitution Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL OBO CALATLANTIC GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Amended Notice 2ND* OF APPEARANCE OBO DEF BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. AND DESIGNATION OF ELETRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO BALLIE ROOFING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO BAILLIE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Notice of Non Availability FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO INC ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To 84 LUMBER COMPANY ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Case 512017CA001776CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/2/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTI is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant

Latest cases where FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC. is a litigant