This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 05:38:10 (UTC).

BUTLER AVALOS, MARIA ISABEL, BUTLER, HOSEA III Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 BUTLER AVALOS, MARIA ISABEL, BUTLER, HOSEA III was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems

BUTLER AVALOS, MARIA ISABEL

BUTLER, HOSEA III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

STRACHAN, LASHAWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketGuardianship Filing Schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketBond Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketLetters of Guardian Advocacy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Co-Guardian Advocates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase Progress Notes from Hearing on November 2, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketJudge's Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition for Co-Guardian Advocates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Physician's Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketClerk Approved Amended Indigent Form

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Review for New Guardianships

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indigency Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketApplication for Appointment of Guardian MIBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketApplication for Appointment of Guardian HB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOath of Co-Guardian, Designation of Resident Agent MIBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOath of Co-Guardian, Designation of Resident Agent HB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Co-Guardian Advocates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 512021GA000202GAAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCriminal Report From Florida Department Of Law Enf HB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCriminal Report From Florida Department Of Law Enf MIBA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRACHAN , LASHAWN