This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2022 at 06:00:49 (UTC).

BURDELL, SELENA Et Al VS GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 BURDELL, SELENA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURDELL, THOMAS

BURDELL, SELENA

Defendant

GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, DAVID FERNANDO

Defendant Attorney

LEHNER, STEVEN DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint PL

05/10/2022:Amended Complaint PL

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

05/06/2022:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Of Appearance DF

04/26/2022:Notice Of Appearance DF

Amended Complaint FILED BY THOMAS BURDELL AND SELENA BURDELL

04/19/2022:Amended Complaint FILED BY THOMAS BURDELL AND SELENA BURDELL

Notice of Change of Attorney AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/14/2022:Notice of Change of Attorney AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

Notice of Mediation Conference

04/07/2022:Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing ZOOM 04/05/2022 @ 2:00 PM

04/04/2022:Notice of Cancellation of Hearing ZOOM 04/05/2022 @ 2:00 PM

Notice of Filing RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLTFS

03/21/2022:Notice of Filing RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLTFS

Notice of Filing RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS

03/21/2022:Notice of Filing RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS

Notice of Hearing ZOOM 04/05/2022 @ 2:00 PM

03/14/2022:Notice of Hearing ZOOM 04/05/2022 @ 2:00 PM

Motion to Transfer FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

01/12/2022:Motion to Transfer FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

Notice Of Substitution Of Counsel FILED BY ATTY OB GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

11/11/2021:Notice Of Substitution Of Counsel FILED BY ATTY OB GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

Motion To Compel FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

11/09/2021:Motion To Compel FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO.

Notice of Non Availability

09/28/2021:Notice of Non Availability

AGREED Order Ratifying And Approving Stipulation FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/09/2021:AGREED Order Ratifying And Approving Stipulation FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

07/07/2021:Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice Of Appearance AMENDED DF

06/09/2021:Notice Of Appearance AMENDED DF

Notice Of Appearance (SECOND AMENDED) FILED BY ATTY OBO DEF

06/08/2021:Notice Of Appearance (SECOND AMENDED) FILED BY ATTY OBO DEF

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/17/2022

Docket***MONIES ARE DUE FOR THE CIRCUIT FILING*****

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketAnswer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Complaint PL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMotion For Extension Of Time FILED BY GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Case Has Been Transferred With In County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLetter of Fees Due

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Transferring Case TO CIRCIUT COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketCase 512022CA001046CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
10/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Service Of Process On The Insurance Comm GEOVERA SPECIALTY INS. CO. 102120

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCopy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRequest To Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories FOR DEFENDANT/ GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Taking Deposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint W/ATTACHMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020

DocketCase 512020CC001698CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less