This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 02/13/2022 at 06:03:00 (UTC).

BRIGHTHOUSE LIFE INSURANCE COM VS FONTAINE, ROBERTO Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 BRIGHTHOUSE LIFE INSURANCE COM filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FONTAINE, ROBERTO. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGHTHOUSE LIFE INSURANCE COM

Defendants

FONTAINE, ROBERTO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONT

RIVER RIDGE COUNTRY CLUB HOMEO

VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Not Classified By Court

FONTAINE, ROBERTO JUAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT, MICHELLE GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Summons Served

02/03/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served

Return of Service on Summons Served ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622 NMA

01/28/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622 NMA

Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622

01/28/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622

Return of Service on Summons Served ON RIVER RIDGE COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 012522

01/26/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON RIVER RIDGE COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 012522

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

01/25/2022:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

01/25/2022:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Verified Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS A-C

01/14/2022:Verified Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS A-C

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

01/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

01/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

01/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

01/14/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

Summons to be Issued by Clerk ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

01/14/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY MICHELLE GARCIA GILBERT ESQ OBO PLTF

01/14/2022:Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY MICHELLE GARCIA GILBERT ESQ OBO PLTF

Form B Notice To Homeowner

01/14/2022:Form B Notice To Homeowner

New Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

01/14/2022:New Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

Notice Of Lis Pendens

01/14/2022:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Value Calculation for Real Property

01/14/2022:Value Calculation for Real Property

Civil Cover Sheet

01/14/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE 012622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON RIVER RIDGE COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 012522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk ROBERTO FONTAINE AKA ROBERTO JUAN FONTAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY MICHELLE GARCIA GILBERT ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm B Notice To Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNew Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Calculation for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS A-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA000110CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVER RIDGE COUNTRY CLUB HOMEO is a litigant

Latest cases where VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI is a litigant

Latest cases where Metlife Insurance Company USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT, MICHELLE