Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 15:50:26 (UTC).

BRANDO, CHRISTINE VS BRANDO, JASON

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 BRANDO, CHRISTINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRANDO, JASON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDO, CHRISTINE

Defendant

BRANDO, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ANGELONE, MISCHELLE C

Defendant Attorney

MYERS, DAWN MICHELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice Final Disposition Of Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 041619 AT 930AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Order Ratifying And Approving Stipulation WITH ATTACHED MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Mediation Agreement RESOLVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Filing W/ATTD CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FILED BY JASON BRANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Mediation Conference (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Referral to Family Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice of Mediation Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Motion FOR REFERRAL TO ALT DISPUTE RESOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Notice of Non Availability FILED BY DAWN MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Filing ATTACHED COPY OF DRIVER LICENSE FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Parenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Filing ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Request To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance FILED BY MISCHELLE D ANGELONE ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY MISCHELLE D ANGELONE ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less