Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 01/10/2019 at 01:31:17 (UTC).

BLAIR, THOMAS E Et Al VS BAYONNETTE TITLE INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2008 BLAIR, THOMAS E filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAYONNETTE TITLE INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLAIR, THOMAS E

YARMOLA, JANET M

Defendants

BAYONNETTE TITLE INC

KNOWLES, NADINE L

HIEBER, PAUL C

UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE

PCH REALTY INC

PASCO COUNTY FLORIDA

HAMMER, RICHARD E

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ROBERT H.

Defendant Attorneys

BERNSTEIN, DALE L

BAUMAN, LAURA SUSAN

STEELE, TIMOTHY SCOTT

COHN, MICHAEL ALAN

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Cancellation SET ON 112116

11/10/2016:Notice Of Cancellation SET ON 112116

Notice Of Hearing 090916 @ 1030AM

07/14/2016:Notice Of Hearing 090916 @ 1030AM

Request FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON W/ATTACHMENTS

06/28/2016:Request FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON W/ATTACHMENTS

Answer And Affirmative Defense TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

02/26/2016:Answer And Affirmative Defense TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Answer And Affirmative Defense TO PLFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY NADINE L KNOWLES

02/17/2016:Answer And Affirmative Defense TO PLFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY NADINE L KNOWLES

Motion To Dismiss FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

02/08/2016:Motion To Dismiss FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Order Granting PLFS THIRD MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

02/02/2016:Order Granting PLFS THIRD MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Notice Of Hearing 012116 @ 9:15 AM

12/21/2015:Notice Of Hearing 012116 @ 9:15 AM

Objection TO FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT HEARING FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

11/05/2015:Objection TO FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT HEARING FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

List Of Exhibits FILED BY PLTF

07/10/2015:List Of Exhibits FILED BY PLTF

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFT

06/01/2015:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFT

Order Granting DEFS MOTION FOR EXTRENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/31/2015:Order Granting DEFS MOTION FOR EXTRENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/23/2015:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Order FINDINGS RULINGS ON DEF UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND AWARD OF ATTYS FEES AND COSTS

01/30/2015:Order FINDINGS RULINGS ON DEF UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND AWARD OF ATTYS FEES AND COSTS

Notice Of Filing ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

10/01/2014:Notice Of Filing ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Of Appearance FILED OBO PLAINTIFF

07/01/2014:Notice Of Appearance FILED OBO PLAINTIFF

Notice Of Hearing 062414 @ 10:30 AM

05/16/2014:Notice Of Hearing 062414 @ 10:30 AM

Motion To Dismiss UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

12/03/2013:Motion To Dismiss UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2017
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Notice Of Cancellation OF HEARING SET ON 040417

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Order For Substitution Counsel OBO FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel FOR UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Notice Of Appearance FILED BY LAURA S BAUMAN OBO FIRST AMERICAN TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY F/K/A UNITED GENERAL TITLE INS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Hearing 040417 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Withdraw Attorney Of Record FILED BY UNITED GENERAL TITLE INS. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Cancellation SET ON 112116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Hearing 112116 1:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2008
  • MTN ORDER APPT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • ASM:CA FF GENERAL; N106057; $255.00; BLAIR THOMAS E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • FILING OPENED FOR SRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • COMPLAINT: COUNT I THRU V W/EXHIBITS A THRU H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO (X) ATTORNEY; HAMMER RICHARD E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO (X) ATTORNEY; KNOWLES NADINE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO (X) ATTORNEY; HIEBER PAUL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • PMT:CA FF GENERAL; N106057; $255.00; BLAIR THOMAS E

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PASCO COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant