This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 16:21:58 (UTC).

BINKLEY, SHELLEY ANN VS NAME CHANGE

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 BINKLEY, SHELLEY ANN filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against NAME CHANGE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BINKLEY, SHELLEY ANN

Defendant

NAME CHANGE

Not Classified By Court

DEMAREST, GORDON JEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • Name Change Form To Florida Department Of Law Enfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Form Number 427 To Bureau Of Vital Statistics Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Final Judgment OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 020419 AT 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Progress Notes FILE SENT TO STAFF ATTY W/FDLE BACKGROUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Affidavit IN COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 68.07(3)(I), FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • AMENDED Petition FOR CHANGE OF NAME(ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Notice on Petition for Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case Progress Notes FILE SENT TO STAFF ATTY W/NO FDLE BACKGROUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Case 512018DR006050DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Petition for Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Copy of Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Certificate Of Birth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less