This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/24/2019 at 06:02:29 (UTC).

BENNETT, TERRY VS CHRIS NOCCO PASCO COUNTY SHERI

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 BENNETT, TERRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRIS NOCCO PASCO COUNTY SHERI. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT, TERRY

Defendant

CHRIS NOCCO PASCO COUNTY SHERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAYNOR, MORGAN LUKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Response To Request For Admissions DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Request To Produce DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served (GOVERNMENT AGENCY) FOR DEFENDANT/ SHERIFF OF PASCO COUNTY ON 032919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To CHRIS NOCCO IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SHERIFF OF PASCO COUNTY ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case 512019CA000962CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY MORGAN L GAYNOR ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY MORGAN L GAYNOR ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less