Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 15:49:35 (UTC).

BECKER, KRISTINA VS BECKER, CHAD

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 BECKER, KRISTINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BECKER, CHAD. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECKER, KRISTINA

Defendant

BECKER, CHAD

Not Classified By Court

GALOUZIS, KRISTINA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ANGELONE, MISCHELLE C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage WITH ATTACHED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 020819 AT 900AM ROOM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Financial Affidavit FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Answer And Waiver , WAIVER OF SERVICE AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Order For Temporary Standing No Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018DR006014DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Financial Affidavit SHORT FORM FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Filing COPY OF DRIVER LICENSE (ATTACHED); PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Marital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Joint Stipulation FOR WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance ; FILED BY MISCHELLE D ANGELONE ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address ; FILED BY MISCHELLE D ANGELONE ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISCHELLE C D'ANGELONE