This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:31:42 (UTC).

BEARDSLEY, GEORGE VS HELT, THOMAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 BEARDSLEY, GEORGE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HELT, THOMAS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEARDSLEY, GEORGE

Defendants

HELT, THOMAS

UNKNOWN TENANT

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

05/01/2019:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 051619 THOMAS HELT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Default Entered THOMAS HELT AND UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; THOMAS HELT 050219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; UNKNOWN TENANT 050219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR THOMAS HELT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC001756CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less