This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/11/2019 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

BARRETT, GEOFFREY VS SAUNDERS, LEO Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 BARRETT, GEOFFREY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAUNDERS, LEO. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRETT, GEOFFREY

Defendants

SAUNDERS, LEO

SAUNDERS, LOREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUDGINS, DREW BEN

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, JULIAN EMORY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial LEO AND LOREE SAUNDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request To Produce TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Waiver and Acceptance of Service FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Case 512019CA000815CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less