This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/11/2019 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

BARNHART, JASON VS BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEU Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 BARNHART, JASON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEU. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNHART, JASON

Defendants

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEU

ZANVARDINE, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

ZANVARDINE, MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

03/27/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

03/07/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

03/07/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Case Progress Notes NEW SUMMONS AND SERVICE PACKETS ISSUED AND MAILED TO ATTY (ORGINAL SUMMONS MISPLACED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Case 512019CA000818CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Request For Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Request For Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less