Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:21:17 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS OWEN, LORI JEAN

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OWEN, LORI JEAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

OWEN, LORI JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Order Granting Extension Of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved LORI JEAN OWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service LORI JEAN OWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004540CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less