Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:50:37 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS MORRIS, HOWARD D

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORRIS, HOWARD D. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

MORRIS, HOWARD D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved; MORRIS HOWARD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 021419 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004098SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service HOWARD D MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Event Date: 02/14/2019 10:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less