This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 18:36:09 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK TRUST COMPANY NA THE VS T K SUAVE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 BANK OF NEW YORK TRUST COMPANY NA THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against T K SUAVE. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

LEXONGTON OAKS OF PASCO COUNTY

SUAVE TERESA KAREN UNKNOWN SPO

SUAVE, TERESA KAREN

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A

Not Classified By Court

SUAVE, TERESA K

TAYLOR TERESA UNKNOWN SPOUSE O

SUAVE TERESA K UNKNOWN SPOUSE

TAYLOR, TERESA K

TAYLOR, TERESA

TAYLOR TERESA K UNKNOWN SPOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, LAURA ASHLEY

Defendant Attorneys

MCELHERAN, TIFFANY LOVE

WOLF, MATTHEW DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate Of Title Issued To THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA

05/08/2019:Certificate Of Title Issued To THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 030419

11/01/2018:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 030419

Notice Of Service ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

08/20/2018:Notice Of Service ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

Order DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

08/07/2018:Order DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

Notice of Filing PLTF

07/31/2018:Notice of Filing PLTF

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFT LEXINGTON OAKS

07/06/2018:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFT LEXINGTON OAKS

Notice of Hearing 06/05/2018 @ 10:00 AM

05/16/2018:Notice of Hearing 06/05/2018 @ 10:00 AM

Motion TO STAY OR ABATE ACTION AND FOR CASE MGT CONFERENCE, FILED BY PLF

09/27/2017:Motion TO STAY OR ABATE ACTION AND FOR CASE MGT CONFERENCE, FILED BY PLF

Request For Admissions FILED BY TERESA SUAVE

01/13/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY TERESA SUAVE

Request To Produce FILED BY TERESA SUAVE

01/13/2017:Request To Produce FILED BY TERESA SUAVE

Order Granting PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCTOBER 17, 2016

10/14/2016:Order Granting PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCTOBER 17, 2016

Affidavit As To Costs

10/12/2016:Affidavit As To Costs

Witness and Exhibit List FILED OBO PLTFS

08/19/2016:Witness and Exhibit List FILED OBO PLTFS

Order Granting MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

06/07/2016:Order Granting MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

Notice of Mediation Conference 052716 AT 1230PM

05/18/2016:Notice of Mediation Conference 052716 AT 1230PM

Default Entered ON U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE GREENPOINT HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2004-4 AND LEXINGTON OAKES OF PASCO COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

05/09/2016:Default Entered ON U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE GREENPOINT HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2004-4 AND LEXINGTON OAKES OF PASCO COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Motion For Default On US BANK NATIONAL ASSN. AS TRUSTEE AND LEXINGTON OAKS OF PASCO COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

05/05/2016:Motion For Default On US BANK NATIONAL ASSN. AS TRUSTEE AND LEXINGTON OAKS OF PASCO COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSN., INC.

Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA KAREN SUAVE

05/05/2016:Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA KAREN SUAVE

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate Of Disbursements 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Title Issued To THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase Progress Notes TITLE PENDING - ERRORS IN SOLD TO INFORMATION: MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS RECORDED IN BODY OF FNAL JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCase Progress Notes TITLE PENDING- FEES DUE ON CASE; DOC STAMPS AND PROPOSED TITLE NEEDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketReal Auction Fee Worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketReal Auction Bid Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Sale with Attached Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication IN BUSINESS OBSERVER NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002271CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document FORM A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Filing WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEXINGTON OAKS OF PASCO COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCELHERAN, TIFFANY LOVE