This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/03/2022 at 08:32:10 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS KNIGHT-GRESTINI, KATHERINE R

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed an Other lawsuit against KNIGHT-GRESTINI, KATHERINE R. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

KNIGHT-GRESTINI, KATHERINE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

Defendant Attorney

MILLER VEAL, JENNIFER LYNN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

03/04/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

03/04/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk -

03/04/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk -

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

03/04/2022:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

03/07/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

Return of Service on Summons Served 031022 NMA KATHERINE R KNIGHT GRESTINI

03/11/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 031022 NMA KATHERINE R KNIGHT GRESTINI

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

03/30/2022:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

03/30/2022:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO KATHERINE R KNIGHT-GRESTINI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 031022 NMA KATHERINE R KNIGHT GRESTINI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC000818CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less