This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 19:22:19 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS J TORRES

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against J TORRES. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants

TORRES JOSE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

CONCORD STATION COMMUNITY ASSO

HOUSTON, LEE LEMAR JR

TORRES, JOSE

TORRES, VALERY

Not Classified By Court

SANTIAGO-TORRES, VALERIE

SANTIAGO, VALERY

TORRES, JOSE I

CHRISTIANA TRUST AS OWNER TRUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADSTONE, ROGER NEIL

Defendant Attorneys

PALACIO, RAMON CARLOS

TSANGARIS, STEVEN NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

08/05/2019:Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF DUE TO TRANSFER OF INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketMotion for Substitution of Party FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse TO PLTFS NOTICE TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL; FILED BY JOSE TORRES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Change Of Address FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketNotice That Case Is At Issue NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 12, 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketMotion To Continue (RENEWED MOTION) OF TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 121216 FILED OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketMotion To Continue FILED BY JOSE TORRES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Filing UNATTACHED AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AFFIDAVIT OF TIME EFFORT COST AND FEES FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002340CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Filing ATTACHED NON RESIDENT COST BOND; FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketInformation Sheet VALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Filing ATTACHED CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE; FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONCORD STATION COMMUNITY ASSO is a litigant

Latest cases where Christiana Trust, not in its Individual Capacity is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant