This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 17:20:29 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS F RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against F RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLK, ALICIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLK, ALICIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CITIBANK NA

Defendants

GREEN EMERALD HOMES LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

RODRIGUEZ, FELIX

WESTBROOK ESTATES HOMEOWNERS A

CORPORATE CENTER ASSOCIATION I

Not Classified By Court

RODRIGUEZ, FELIX M JR

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAULA, ANTONIO ANDRES

NETHERSOLE, JULISSA

Defendant Attorneys

KNIGHT, ADAM JOSEPH

MELTON, HOWELL WEBSTER

 

Court Documents

Certificate Of Title Issued To CITIBANK NA

07/27/2017:Certificate Of Title Issued To CITIBANK NA

Copy Of CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

07/24/2017:Copy Of CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

Certificate Of Sale With Attached Proof Of Publica SOLD TO CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDV CAPACITY $194,600.00 MLD 7

07/06/2017:Certificate Of Sale With Attached Proof Of Publica SOLD TO CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDV CAPACITY $194,600.00 MLD 7

Proof Of Publication 070617

06/27/2017:Proof Of Publication 070617

Notice Of Sale 070617

06/09/2017:Notice Of Sale 070617

Proof Of Publication 061517

06/06/2017:Proof Of Publication 061517

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure *AMENDED* 070617

06/02/2017:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure *AMENDED* 070617

ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO SCRIVENERS ERROR

06/02/2017:ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO SCRIVENERS ERROR

Notice Of Sale 061517

05/17/2017:Notice Of Sale 061517

Order Granting Motion To Reset Sale 061517

05/11/2017:Order Granting Motion To Reset Sale 061517

Motion to Reschedule Sale FILED BY PLF

05/09/2017:Motion to Reschedule Sale FILED BY PLF

Motion To Amend FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO SCRIVENERS ERROR; FILED BY PLTF

04/26/2017:Motion To Amend FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO SCRIVENERS ERROR; FILED BY PLTF

Proof Of Publication 050417

03/13/2017:Proof Of Publication 050417

Notice Of Sale 050417

02/22/2017:Notice Of Sale 050417

Final Disposition Form

02/06/2017:Final Disposition Form

Order Granting MOTION TO CORRECT SCRIVENERS ERROR

02/06/2017:Order Granting MOTION TO CORRECT SCRIVENERS ERROR

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 050417

02/06/2017:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 050417

Joint Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

02/03/2017:Joint Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCertificate Of Disbursements 0.00 MLD 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Title Issued To CITIBANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy Of CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCase Progress Notes CERTIFICATE OF TITLE PENDING - NEED PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Sale With Attached Proof Of Publica SOLD TO CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDV CAPACITY $194,600.00 MLD 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof Of Publication 070617

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Sale 070617

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof Of Publication 061517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure *AMENDED* 070617

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002144CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 05/09/2017; Reopen Close Date: 05/11/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/26/2017; Reopen Close Date: 06/02/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN EMERALD HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CORPORATE CENTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTBROOK ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant