This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2022 at 13:30:53 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants

MAKI, ROLAND K

BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUS

STAR POINTE CAPITAL LLC AS TRU

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNTER, TENIA CHIMERE

DROSKY, TODD CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

MOSKOWITZ, NICOLE RACHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Service PL

02/11/2022:Notice Of Service PL

Motion For Extension Of Time PL

12/28/2021:Motion For Extension Of Time PL

Notice of Change of Attorney PL

12/28/2021:Notice of Change of Attorney PL

Return of Service on Summons Served ON BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUSTEE 112921

12/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUSTEE 112921

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON ROLAND K MAKI

12/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON ROLAND K MAKI

Return of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2 113021 NMA

12/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2 113021 NMA

Return of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 113021 NMA

12/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 113021 NMA

Return of Service on Summons Served ON STAR POINTE CAPITAL LLC AS TRUSTEE 121321

12/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON STAR POINTE CAPITAL LLC AS TRUSTEE 121321

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories DF

12/16/2021:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories DF

Request To Produce DF

12/16/2021:Request To Produce DF

Motion For Extension Of Time DF

12/16/2021:Motion For Extension Of Time DF

Notice Of Appearance DF

12/16/2021:Notice Of Appearance DF

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

11/17/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

11/17/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

11/17/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

11/17/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

11/17/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

11/15/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Service PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Extension Of Time PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Attorney PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON BLACK POINT ASSETS INC AS TRUSTEE 112921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved ON ROLAND K MAKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2 113021 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 113021 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON STAR POINTE CAPITAL LLC AS TRUSTEE 121321

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNew Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm B Notice To Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Calculation for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA002677CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Star Pointe Capital Llc As Trustee Of The 12748Lvd is a litigant

Latest cases where Black Point Assets Inc As Trustee Of The 12748 Lak is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TODD DROSKY, ESQ