This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 15:21:55 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS A J GRABOWSKI II

Case Summary

On 06/23/2015 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against A J GRABOWSKI II. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROGER, GREGORY G and BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROGER, GREGORY G

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

GRABOWSKI ALFRED JR II UNKNOWN

TIERRA DEL SOL HOMEOWNERS ASSO

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

GRABOWSKI, ALFRED J II

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

GRABOWSKI, ALFRED JOSEPH II

CHRISTIANA TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLADSTONE, ROGER NEIL

DE LEON, MICHELLE ANNETTE

Defendant Attorney

MULLIS, BRANDON K

 

Court Documents

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 100818

08/24/2018:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 100818

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 072418@9AM

06/26/2018:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 072418@9AM

Return of Service on Summons Unserved BEVERLY RHODEN

03/16/2018:Return of Service on Summons Unserved BEVERLY RHODEN

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE, AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

02/13/2018:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE, AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, FILED BY PLF

02/07/2018:Motion to Set Aside/Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, FILED BY PLF

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT

01/30/2018:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT

UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 022018

01/16/2018:UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 022018

UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 022018

01/16/2018:UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 022018

Notice of Hearing ON 011218 @2PM

11/15/2017:Notice of Hearing ON 011218 @2PM

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY PLTF

05/07/2016:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY PLTF

Default Entered ON DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRANOWSKI II AND UNKNOWN TENANT #1

04/06/2016:Default Entered ON DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRANOWSKI II AND UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Default Entered AGAINST ALFRED J. GRABOWSKI II A/K/A ALFRED JOSEPH GRABOWSKI II

01/06/2016:Default Entered AGAINST ALFRED J. GRABOWSKI II A/K/A ALFRED JOSEPH GRABOWSKI II

Default Entered AGAINST UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

01/06/2016:Default Entered AGAINST UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Motion For Default On ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

01/05/2016:Motion For Default On ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

Affidavit Of Non Military Service AS TO ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II

01/05/2016:Affidavit Of Non Military Service AS TO ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II

Motion For Default On UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

01/05/2016:Motion For Default On UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

Motion For Default On (JUDICIAL) UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II AND UNKNOWN TENANT 1

01/05/2016:Motion For Default On (JUDICIAL) UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II AND UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Affidavit Of Non Military Service UNABLE TO DETERMINE AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II

01/05/2016:Affidavit Of Non Military Service UNABLE TO DETERMINE AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALFRED J GRABOWSKI II

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCorrespondence RETURNING ORIGINALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketOnline Auction Canceled - COURT ORDER TO FOLLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketOrder ON PLTF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE, RELEASE THE LIS PENDENS, RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS THE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketMotion TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL SALE, RELEASE LIS PENDENS RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION; FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Filing ATTCHD CERTIFICATION OF NOTE FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 06/21/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 02/07/2018; Reopen Close Date: 02/13/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 01/24/2018; Reopen Close Date: 01/30/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIERRA DEL SOL HOMEOWNERS ASSO is a litigant

Latest cases where Christiana Trust, not in its Individual Capacity is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant