This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:44:23 (UTC).

BALLA, RAFMAN VS NEAL, DAVID WAYNE

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 BALLA, RAFMAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NEAL, DAVID WAYNE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALLA, RAFMAN

Defendant

NEAL, DAVID WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

12/17/2018:Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Returned Mail DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served POSTED 010419 DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLTF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Default Entered AGAINST DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For COURT'S Default On DAVIE WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For Default On DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Summons Returned Served 121718 DAVID W NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; DAVID WAYNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Case 512018CC004963CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less