Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:32:00 (UTC).

BALESTRIERI, JOHN A VS GOLDSMITH, JASON Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 BALESTRIERI, JOHN A filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GOLDSMITH, JASON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALESTRIERI, JOHN A

Defendants

GOLDSMITH, JASON

GOLDSMITH, WENDY

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN, NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eviction

10/01/2019:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Order OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Answer FILED BY WENDY GOLDSMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To JASON GOLDSMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON WENDY GOLDSMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC004140CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less