This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/19/2019 at 06:01:50 (UTC).

AYERS-HENDLEY, PATRICIA VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 AYERS-HENDLEY, PATRICIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYERS-HENDLEY, PATRICIA

Defendants

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS

ANTON, DENNIS JOHN

FRANCIS, KENNETH HAGIN

LOCASCIO, DONNA M

TETRA TECH INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ, ALYSSA LENORE

Defendant Attorney

SHELTON, ADAM CHRISTOPHER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY ADAM C SHELTON ESQ OBO KENNETH HAGIN FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KENNETH HAGIN FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY KENNETH HAGIN FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice of Filing PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 040519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served DONNA M LOCASCIO 040219 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Notice of Filing VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KENNETH HAGIN FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ON TETRA TECH INC 040119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served KENNETH HAGIN FRANCIS 033019 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TETRA TECH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY ALYSSA KATZ ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less