Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:00:09 (UTC).

AUTOVEST LLC VS ANGELO, ALYSSA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 AUTOVEST LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELO, ALYSSA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST LLC

Defendants

DUNEKACK, JANET

ANGELO, ALYSSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Limited Appearance; AUTOVEST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • County Court Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved; DUNEKACK JANET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 010219; DUNEKACK JANET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/13/2019 @ 1:30 PM; DUNEKACK JANET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/13/2019 @ 1:30 PM; ANGELO ALYSSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004100SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint; AUTOVEST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Event Date: 02/13/2019 13:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOVEST, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.