This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 10:07:37 (UTC).

AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP Et Al VS BARILE, JOSEPH SCOTT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARILE, JOSEPH SCOTT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP

THERRIEN, RICHARD

Defendant

BARILE, JOSEPH SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MYERS, JONATHAN STUART

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/13/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

09/13/2021:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

Summons to be Issued by Clerk TO JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

09/13/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk TO JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/08/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

09/24/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/08/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

Return of Service on Summons Served JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE 100921

10/14/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE 100921

Pre-Trial Conference Order 011822 10:00 A, 2B

11/10/2021:Pre-Trial Conference Order 011822 10:00 A, 2B

Motion To Continue FINAL TRIAL TO NEXT AVAILABLE DATE FILED BY PLTF

12/30/2021:Motion To Continue FINAL TRIAL TO NEXT AVAILABLE DATE FILED BY PLTF

Order RESETTING NO JURY TRIAL (PARTIES TO CALL TO SCHEDULE)

01/11/2022:Order RESETTING NO JURY TRIAL (PARTIES TO CALL TO SCHEDULE)

Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

01/12/2022:Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

Notice of Non-Jury Trial 030822 AT 130PM

02/18/2022:Notice of Non-Jury Trial 030822 AT 130PM

Notice of Filing

02/18/2022:Notice of Filing

Witness List

02/18/2022:Witness List

List Of Exhibits

02/18/2022:List Of Exhibits

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWitness List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial 030822 AT 130PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RESETTING NO JURY TRIAL (PARTIES TO CALL TO SCHEDULE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Continue FINAL TRIAL TO NEXT AVAILABLE DATE FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference Order 011822 10:00 A, 2B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/08/2021 13:30; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE 100921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/08/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk TO JOSEPH SCOTT BARILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005213SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club South Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS JONATHAN S