Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 15:44:20 (UTC).

APPLEGATE, ERIN AMBER VS APPLEGATE, SHERMAN BYRON

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 APPLEGATE, ERIN AMBER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against APPLEGATE, SHERMAN BYRON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APPLEGATE, ERIN AMBER

Defendant

APPLEGATE, SHERMAN BYRON

Not Classified By Court

GORBY, ERIN AMBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • Certificate Of Completion ERIN AMBER APPLEGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage WITH ATTACHED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Order Setting Hearing 021419 9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Memorandum FROM GM TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Waiver of Mandatory Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Certificate Of Completion SHERMAN BYRON APPLEGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Motion For Default On SHERMAN BYRON APPLEGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Financial Affidavit LONG FORM FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Copy of Drivers License FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Parenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Corroborating Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR SHERMAN BYRON APPLEGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less