Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 14:16:39 (UTC).

APPLEGATE, DONNA P, JENNINGS, WILLIAM K Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 APPLEGATE, DONNA P, JENNINGS, WILLIAM K was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

APPLEGATE, DONNA P

Decedent

JENNINGS, WILLIAM K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketORDER ON REVIEW FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketORIGNIAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT CLOCK DATE MARCH 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT CLOCK DATE MARCH 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER CLOCK DATE MARCH 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLetter of Clerk's Determination as to Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketInitial Trust Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAcceptance of Successor Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCopy of Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing - Funeral Bill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Separate Writing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Concerning Criminal History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative Designation of Resident Agent and Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000330CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN